EP1418294 - Lock cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaba GmbH Ulrich-Bremi-Strasse 2 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | [2008/38] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Kaba GmbH Wiener Strasse 41-43 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kornhofer, Markus / Atzelsdorf 95/1 3451, Atzelsdorf / AT | 02 /
Hagl, Alfred / Heiligenkreuzer Str. 9-5 3141, Kapelln / AT | [2014/34] |
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
Kornhofer, Markus Atzelsdorf 95/1 3451, Atzelsdorf / AT | ||
02 /
Hagl, Alfred Heiligenkreuzer Str. 9-5 3141, Kapelln / AT | Representative(s) | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Postfach 169 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/20] | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03104084.3 | 05.11.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | AT20020000747U | 05.11.2002 Original published format: AT 74702 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2004/20] | AT20020000747U | 05.11.2002 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418294 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418294 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418294 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B27/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
E05B27/0017 (EP);
E05B17/007 (EP);
E05B27/0007 (EP);
E05B27/0057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | Schliesszylinder | [2004/20] | English: | Lock cylinder | [2004/20] | French: | Serrure cylindrique | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2003 | CY | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | LU | 05.11.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | CY | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE255006 (MÜLLER CARL AUGUST) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0771920 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE633934 (OSKAR CAMILLO RECHT) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0771920 | DE633934 |