EP1430945 - System and method for mixing powders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spraylat Corporation 143 Sparks Avenue Pelham New York 10803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Spraylat Corporation 143 Sparks Avenue Pelham, New York 10803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladatto, Steven M. 1340 Kiowa Drive East Lake Kiowa 76240 / US | 02 /
Hughes, Don Rt. 2, Box 954 Nocona 76255 / US | 03 /
Seatherton, Gareth 1809 Floral Drive Gainesville 76240 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03104742.6 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020324729 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: US 324729 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430945 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430945 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/16, B01F13/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B01F27/11253 (EP,US);
B01F27/805 (EP,US);
B01F33/35 (EP,US);
B01F2101/30 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0422 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0481 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0495 (EP,US);
B01F23/50 (EP,US);
B01F23/60 (EP,US);
B01F27/191 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Mischen von Pulver | [2004/26] | English: | System and method for mixing powders | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour mélanger des poudres | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | CZ | 01.06.2005 | EE | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | FR | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | RO | 01.06.2005 | SI | 01.06.2005 | SK | 01.06.2005 | TR | 01.06.2005 | BG | 01.09.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | DE | 02.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | HU | 02.12.2005 | CY | 17.12.2005 | IE | 19.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
EE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
RO | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
HU | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 17.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
FR | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
EE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
RO | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
HU | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 17.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
EE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
HU | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 17.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
EE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
HU | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 17.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
EE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
HU | 02.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SK | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SI | 01.06.2005 | ||
BG | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3307834 (DENNIS WILDE) [X] 4-6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-3,7-14; | [A]US4135828 (CABAK JAMES E) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]DE3123362 (HERFELD FRIEDRICH W [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5123747 (DERKSEN MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |