EP1550861 - Method and device for determining of the status of a probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2006/36] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher 8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ammann, Juergen Stauffacherstrasse 175 8004, Zürich / CH | 02 /
Peer, Alfred Moosmattstrasse 3b 6330, Cham / CH | 03 /
Oberlin, René Tägerhardweg 30 5436, Würrenlos / CH | 04 /
Anders, Klaus-Dieter Im Täli 12 5452, Oberrohrdorf / CH | 05 /
Zwicky, Christian Meisenrain 71 8044, Gockhausen / CH | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03104932.3 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550861 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550861 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N27/403, G01N27/417 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
G01N27/4165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Zustandes einer Messsonde | [2005/27] | English: | Method and device for determining of the status of a probe | [2005/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour déterminer l'état d'un capteur | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2008
28.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE Endress und Hauser AG + Co. KG Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Hahn, Christian Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH Patserve - Patentabteilung Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2008
Endress und Hauser AG + Co. KG Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Hahn, Christian Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH Patentabteilung Colmarer Strasse 6 D-79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | 28.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/29] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | CZ | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | RO | 18.04.2007 | SI | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | HU | 19.10.2007 | AT | 23.12.2007 | LU | 23.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/43] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
TR | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
HU | 19.10.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
AT | 23.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 18.04.2007 | |
ES | 29.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4652451 (LEEDHAM PETER A [GB], et al) [Y] 9,10,12 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 45 *; | [X]US6173600 (HARADA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 8 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 16 - line 31 *; | [XAY] - METTLER-TOLEDO, "The new O2 range of sensors", PHARMACEUTICAL NEWS, vol. 1, (200301), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.elscolab.com, (20040325), XP002274928 [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-7,11 [Y] 9,10,12 | [XY] - "pH electrode with integral temperature sensor", ENGINEERINGTALK, URL: http://www.engineeringtalk.com/news/mee/mee107.htm, (20040325), XP002274929 [X] 8 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10,12 | [A] - "Self-cleaning sensor in pH control", ENGINEERINGTALK, URL: http:77www.engineeringtalk.com/news/mee/mee116.htm, (20040325), XP002274930 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |