EP1433592 - Method and system for producing a spliceless tread ring of cured elastomeric material for assembly to a tire carcass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marangoni Tread S.p.A. Località Colle Baiocco 03013 Ferentino / IT | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marangoni, Mario Via Bellavista I, 14 38068, Rovereto / IT | 02 /
Magistrale, Vitantonio Via Mastruccia, 18 03100 Frosinone / IT | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03104948.9 | 23.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | IT2002TO01123 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: IT TO20021123 | [2004/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433592 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1433592 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433592 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/52 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
B29D30/52 (EP,US);
B29D2030/523 (EP,US);
B29K2105/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Laufflächenrings aus elastomerem Material | [2007/35] | English: | Method and system for producing a spliceless tread ring of cured elastomeric material for assembly to a tire carcass | [2004/27] | French: | Procédé et système de production d'une bande annulaire de roulement en matériau élastomère | [2004/27] |
Former [2004/27] | System und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Laufflächenring aus elastomeren Material | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.02.2008 | CZ | 06.02.2008 | DK | 06.02.2008 | EE | 06.02.2008 | FI | 06.02.2008 | NL | 06.02.2008 | RO | 06.02.2008 | SI | 06.02.2008 | SK | 06.02.2008 | TR | 06.02.2008 | BG | 06.05.2008 | SE | 06.05.2008 | GR | 07.05.2008 | PT | 07.07.2008 | HU | 07.08.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
TR | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
HU | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
HU | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 06.02.2008 | |
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 06.02.2008 | |
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 06.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1234593 (GOODRICH CO B F) [Y] 1-35 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US3829271 (TAYLOR D) [Y] 1-35 * column 2, line 31 - line 49; figures 1,3,4; claim 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US3963393 (BAREFOOT CARLTON K) [A] 1-35 * abstract *; | [X]US3994653 (MARANGONI CARLO) [X] 1-35 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * * abstract *; | [A]US5354406 (KING MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 2, line 37 - line 65 * * column 10, line 31 - line 41; figure 2; claims 1,12 *; | [A]EP0825014 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1,27* page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 11; figure 5; claims 1,9 * |