EP1333561 - Rotor cooling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UQM Technologies, Inc. 7501 Miller Drive Frederick Colorado 80530 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states UQM Technologies, Inc. 7501 Miller Drive Frederick, Colorado 80530 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denton, Darin 4463 Highway 103 Idaho Springs, Colorado 80452 / US | 02 /
Lutz, Jon 9408 W. 104th Way Westminster, Colorado 80021 / US | 03 /
Lewis, Kevin R. 6000 South Elati Street Littleton, Colorado 80120-2719 / US | 04 /
Frazzani, Jeff 8020 Stuart Street Westminster, Colorado 80031 / US | 05 /
Ley, Josh 606 S. Cole Court Lakewood, Colorado 80228 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250343.5 | 20.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | US20020058414 | 30.01.2002 Original published format: US 58414 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333561 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333561 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/08 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H02K9/08 (EP,US);
H02K1/20 (EP,US);
H02K1/32 (EP,US);
H02K9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/02] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotorkühlungsvorrichtung | [2003/32] | English: | Rotor cooling apparatus | [2003/32] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement de rotor | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE470020 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE867568 (DEMAG ZUG GMBH) [A] 3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1136412 (MEZ BRNO NARODNI PODNIK VYV ZD) [A] 7,9* the whole document *; | [X]US3916231 (CATHEY JIMMIE J) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4320559 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19905538 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 4 * figures 6,7 * |