EP1331702 - Coaxial cable connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, John Wesley 6091 Chambers Hill Road Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17111 / US | 02 /
Hardy, Douglas John 545 South Wood Street Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | 03 /
Raudenbush, James Michael 57 Parmer Drive Halifax, Pennsylvania 17032 / US | 04 /
Foltz, Keith Richard 214 S. Harrisburg Street Oberlin, Pennsylvania 17113 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250438.3 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | US20020056700 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 56700 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331702 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331702 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331702 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
H01R9/05 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/5213 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/09] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Koaxialkabelverbinder | [2003/31] | English: | Coaxial cable connector | [2003/31] | French: | Connecteur pour un câble coaxial | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 10.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0090538 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0382374 (ITT [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19854503 (TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-11* abstract * | by applicant | EP0090538 | DE19854503 |