EP1331349 - Sash system having doors being openable and closable by sliding and folding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakatani, Kazumaro 63-7 Ko, Ikegami, Mikuni-cho Sakai-gun Fukui-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Nakatani, Kazumaro 63-7 Ko, Ikegami, Mikuni-cho Sakai-gun, Fukui-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250472.2 | 27.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | JP20020017046 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002017046 | JP20020205256 | 15.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002205256 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331349 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331349 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/48, E06B3/50 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
E06B3/481 (EP,US);
E06B3/48 (KR);
E06B3/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/02] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schiebefalttür oder -fenster | [2003/31] | English: | Sash system having doors being openable and closable by sliding and folding | [2003/31] | French: | Porte ou fenêtre coulissante et repliable | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 22.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2002155671 ; | [PY]JP2001280018 ; | JP2001234668 [ ]; | [A]US1345669 (JAMES GIBBONS FRANCIS JOSEPH) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]FR910316 (COUSINARD) [A] 6 * page 2, line 26 - line 97; figures 1-4,6,7 *; | [Y]GB1589950 (CORDELLA L, et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 28 - line 103; figures 1-4,6 *; | [A]JP2001234668 (NAT HOUSE IND) [A] 1,5,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2001280018 (NAKATANI TOSHIMARO) [Y] 1-3,5 * the whole document * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002155671 A 20020531 (NAKATANI TOSHIMARO) [PX] 1-3,9 * abstract * | [PY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001280018 A 20011010 (NAKATANI TOSHIMARO) [PY] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001234668 A 20010831 (NATIONAL HOUSE INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * |