EP1336727 - Muffler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaku, Yoichi Guranmezonmitsukyo 501, 1-31-12, Sasanodai Asahi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0816 / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Kai 2-11-18, Shiroyamate Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0825 / JP | 03 /
Mihara, Hidefumi Parukuberunissan 613, 4-24-1, Onodai Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0011 / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Tsuyoshi Nissansagamiryo B-210, 3-4688-1, Sobudai Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/34] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250475.5 | 27.01.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020040636 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040636 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336727 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1336727 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N1/02, F01N1/08, F01N1/06 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
F01N1/06 (EP,US);
F01N1/02 (EP,US);
F01N1/089 (EP,US);
F01N2210/02 (EP,US);
F01N2210/04 (EP,US);
F01N2210/06 (EP,US);
F01N2450/22 (EP,US);
F01N2490/02 (EP,US);
F01N2490/06 (EP,US);
F01N2490/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/30] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schalldämpfer | [2003/34] | English: | Muffler | [2003/34] | French: | Silencieux | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH11132024 ; | [A]JPH08314469 ; | [DA]JPH0713573 ; | [DA]JPH07175485 ; | [A]US5614699 (YASHIRO HARUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [A]US5723827 (SASAKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 15,16 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0863054 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,11,12,15 * column 10, line 27 - column 11, line 25 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0869037 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5823600 (IWAO KEIJIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0889459 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11132024 A 19990518 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [DY] 1,2,4,11,12,15 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08314469 A 19961129 (YAMAKAWA IND CO LTD;NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07013573 A 19950117 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,12-14,16 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07175485 A 19950714 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0713573 | JPH07175485 | JPH09125930 |