EP1332746 - Individually wrapped sanitary napkin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi, Ehime-ken 182 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudo, Jun, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250525.7 | 29.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | JP20020025924 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002025924 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1332746 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1332746 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332746 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/551 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A61F13/5514 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Einzeln verpackte Hygienevorlage | [2003/32] | English: | Individually wrapped sanitary napkin | [2003/32] | French: | Serviette hygiénique emballée individuellement | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | LI | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | IE | 29.01.2008 | LU | 29.01.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/34] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
LI | 16.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4556146 (SWANSON JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8 * column W * [Y] 2,5,7,9,10; | [Y]EP0270058 (PERSONAL PRODUCTS CO [US]) [Y] 4 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9321878 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * page 28, line 1 - page 30, paragraph 2; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US5330461 (LEEKER KAREN K [US]) [A] 4* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9842286 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 2,5,7,9,10 * page 19, line 34 - page 20, line 23; claim - *; | [DX]EP0963748 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON IND COM [BR]) [DX] 1,3,6,8 * figures 7-11 *; | [XY]WO0019954 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 4; | [X]WO0124748 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8 * page 20, line 17 - page 22, line 25 * * page 26, line 16 - page 27, line 3; figures 5-11 *; | [X]US6312417 (HANSSON ROY [SE]) [X] 1,3,6,8 * figure -; claim - * |