Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
12.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
25.05.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
16.03.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
09.03.2007 | Change - representative | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
09.02.2007 | First examination report | |
03.02.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.01.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.07.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
26.01.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.01.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.01.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
19.01.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |