Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7005614 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2006 | B2 | US2004040447 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20020052598 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100514908B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | B1 | KR20040021142 | 10.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020052598 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004093105 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020052598 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1395087 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | A3 | EP1395087 | 03.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20020052598 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1224801C | 26.10.2005 | C | CN1480689 | 10.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020052598 | 02.09.2002 |