EP1343293 - Provision of free internet access for customers purchasing merchandise [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagasaka, Fumio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Yuichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250981.2 | 18.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | JP20020045406 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002045406 | JP20030033741 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003033741 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343293 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1343293 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Bereitstellung des freien Internet-Zuganges für die Kunden, die Waren kaufen | [2003/37] | English: | Provision of free internet access for customers purchasing merchandise | [2003/37] | French: | Fourniture d'accès libre d'Internet pour des clients achetant des marchandises | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | BE | 10.01.2007 | CH | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | CZ | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | EE | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | FR | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | LI | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | SI | 10.01.2007 | SK | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | LU | 18.02.2007 | IE | 19.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | BG | 11.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | ES | 21.04.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | HU | 11.07.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LU | 18.02.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5933811 (ANGLES PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-15,21-24,30-35,41,42 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 7 * * column 8, line 33 - line 67 * * column 9, line 27 - line 44 * * column 10, line 33 - line 59 * * column 12, line 12 - line 60 * * figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 5-9,16-20,25-29,36-40; | [Y]WO0143416 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 2,3,5-9,11,13,14,16-20,22,23,25-29,31,33,34,36-40,42 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 14 ** page 5, line 13 - line 17 *; | [XY]EP1137234 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1,4,10,12,15,21,24,30,32,35,41 * column 1, line 36 - line 58 * * column 2, line 35 - line 47 * * column 2, line 5 - line 16 * * column 5, line 5 - line 33 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,5-9,11,13,14,16-20,22,23,25-29,31,33,34,36-40,42 |