EP1337089 - System and method for maintaining the physical location association of an IP telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Knowledge Corporation 350 Legget Drive Ottawa Ontario K2K 2W7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Mitel Knowledge Corporation 350 Legget Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2W7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunlap, Edward Darl 1255 Wheatfield Drive Lawrenceville, GA 30043 / US | 02 /
Kittle, George Thomas 14216 Rock Canyon Drive Centerville, VA 20121 / US | 03 /
Pucyk, Andre Joseph 130 Canongate Trail Scarborough, Ontario M1V 3G9 / CA | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03250988.7 | 18.02.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | US20020080039 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: US 80039 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1337089 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1337089 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/24 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H04M7/0075 (EP,US);
H04L41/0213 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L65/1046 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04L61/35 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M2242/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Instandhaltung der Zuordnung eines physikalischen Ortes zu einem IP Telefon | [2003/34] | English: | System and method for maintaining the physical location association of an IP telephone | [2003/34] | French: | Système et procédé pour maintenir l'association de la location physique d'un téléphone IP | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0165763 (3COM CORP [US]) [X] 9,11 * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 22, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 2 * * page 26, paragraph 1 - page 32, paragraph 2 * * claim 16 * * figures 1-4C *[A] 1-8,10 |