EP1339219 - Color image reading apparatus and color image reading method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For:DE
GB
FR
Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2003/35] | For:DE
GB
FR
Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Naohiro 2-22-23, Sakuradai Isehara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251008.3 | 19.02.2003 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | JP20020044264 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002044264 | JP20020353408 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002353408 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339219 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339219 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/48, H04N1/58 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
H04N1/484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Farbbildlesevorrichtung und Verfahren | [2003/35] | English: | Color image reading apparatus and color image reading method | [2003/35] | French: | Appareil et procédé de lecture d'images en couleurs | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.05.2005 | [2007/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4930008 (SUZUKI KIYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5191406 (BRANDESTINI MARCO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 14, line 19 - line 36; figures 2,8,9 *; | [A]EP0822706 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US5859712 (KIM EUN-JIN [KR]) |