EP1343071 - Creating a locally managed instance of a network printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemp, Devon James c/o Canon Dev. Americas, Inc., 110 Innovation Dr. Irvine, California 92612 / US | 02 /
Carcerano, Christopher John c/o Canon Dev. Americas, Inc., 110 Innovation Dr. Irvine, California 92612 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251095.0 | 24.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | US20020092283 | 07.03.2002 Original published format: US 92283 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1343071 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1343071 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1225 (EP,US);
G06F3/1288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/19] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erzeugung einer lokal verwalteten Instanz eines Netzwerkdruckers | [2003/37] | English: | Creating a locally managed instance of a network printer | [2003/37] | French: | Création d'une instance d'une imprimante de réseau gérée localement | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 04.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6094679 (TENG CHIA-CHI [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - line 67 * * column 3, line 22 - line 63 * * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 12 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 4 * * column 9, line 22 - line 40 *; | [X]GB2347766 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 32 - column 6, line 40; table 1 *; | [A]US6222638 (OTALA TAPANI JUHA [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [E]EP1341077 (XEROX CORP [US]) [E] 1-3,7,9-12,16,18-21,25,27-30,34,36 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraph [0008]; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | US6094679 | GB2347766 |