EP1351501 - Method and system for accessing video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newell, John Christopher William BBC, Res. & Development Dept., Kingswood Warren Tadworth, Surrey KT20 6NP / GB | 02 /
Lord, Joseph BBC, Res. & Development Dept., Kingswood Warren Tadworth, Surrey KT20 6NP / GB | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251660.1 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | GB20020006486 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206486 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1351501 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1351501 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/93, H04N5/765 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/41] | H04N5/93 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/41] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Videodatenzugang | [2003/41] | English: | Method and system for accessing video data | [2003/41] | French: | Procédé et système pour accéder aux données vidéo | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2001014891 (HOFFERT ERIC M [US], et al) [X] 15-18,24-26,35-38,44-47 * paragraph [0360] * * paragraph [0403] * [A] 1; | [A]US2001030660 (ZAINOULLINE ROUSTEM [US]) [A] 1,15,35,36 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0054] *; | [XD]EP1164791 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XD] 1,15-18,21,23-26,28-31,35-38,41,43-46,48-51 * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0211] *; | [XP]WO0251139 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [XP] 15,16,18,24,30,35,36,38,44,50 * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 2; figure 5 * * page 9, line 26 - line 32 *; | [XP]EP1271359 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [XP] 15 * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * |