EP1361544 - System and method for editing electronic images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saund, Eric 469 Clifton Avenue San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
Moran, Thomas P. 1037 Greenwood Avenue Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 03 /
Larner, Daniel L. 1495 Oak Canyon Drive San Jose, California 95120 / US | 04 /
Mahoney, James V. 4175 Alto Mesa Avenue Palo Alto, Califonia 94306 / US | 05 /
Fleet, David J. 520 Kenwood Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 06 /
Popat, Ashok C. 625 Cedar Street, Apt. K San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03251707.0 | 19.03.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | US20020104805 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: US 104805 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1361544 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1361544 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361544 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Editieren elektronischer Bilder | [2003/46] | English: | System and method for editing electronic images | [2003/46] | French: | Système et procédé d'édition d'images électroniques | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0637812 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 2 * * column 8, line 23 - line 42 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 10 * * column 12, line 23 - column 13, line 14 * * column 16, line 20 - line 45 *; | [X]EP0816999 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 9, line 27 - column 12, line 14 *; | [X]US5912668 (SCIAMMARELLA EDUARDO [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 55 *; | [A]US5926186 (ITOH YASUNARI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** column 35, line 6 - column 36, line 54 *; | [X]US6020895 (AZAMI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 23, line 15 - line 43 *; | [A]US6184860 (YAMAKAWA TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * column 2, line 55 - line 59 * * column 3, line 35 - line 39 * * column 9, line 34 - line 42 * * column 23, line 1 - line 17 * * column 25, line 32 - line 44 * |