Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1351186
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.05.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.03.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.03.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
01.02.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.11.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
15.11.2004 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.11.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.11.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.11.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.02.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
22.08.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |