EP1352622 - Distal component for wrist prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw Indiana 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw Indiana 46581 / US | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ball, Robert J. 11 Stone Camp Train Winona Lake, IN 46590 / US | 02 /
Trail, Ian A. Hall Lane, Appley Bridge Wigan, Lancashire, WN6 9EP / GB | 03 /
Pascaud, Raphael St Anthony's Road Beeston, Leeds / GB | 04 /
Beckenbaugh, Robert 2825 Fox Chase Lane SW Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 05 /
Geissler, William 67 Terrapin Drive Brandon, MS 39042 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252008.2 | 29.03.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020368740 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 368740 | US20030396644 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: US 396644 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352622 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1352622 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352622 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/4261 (EP,US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30125 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3021 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30253 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30339 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30405 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30408 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30474 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30774 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3079 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30797 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4264 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | Distales Teil einer Handgelenksprothese | [2003/42] | English: | Distal component for wrist prosthesis | [2003/42] | French: | Composant distal d'une prothèse de poignet | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | BE | 23.11.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | CZ | 23.11.2005 | EE | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | RO | 23.11.2005 | SI | 23.11.2005 | SK | 23.11.2005 | TR | 23.11.2005 | BG | 23.02.2006 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | HU | 24.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
CZ | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5314485 (JUDET THIERRY [FR]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5458646 (GIACHINO A ALAN [CA], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 4 - line 32; figures 3-5,8 *; | [A]US6059832 (MENON JAY [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 67; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]EP1066807 (SCHAEFER BERND [CH]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3,10-15 * |