EP1350701 - Landing gear and method of assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-Holland, Inc. P.O. Box 2099 467 Ottawa Ave. Holland, Michigan 49422-2099 / US | [2008/13] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states The Holland Group, Inc. P.O. Box 2099, 467 Ottawa Avenue Holland, Michigan 49422-2099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peveler, Michael W. 101 South Elm Street, P.O.Box 370 Warrenton, Missouri 63383-0370 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252095.9 | 02.04.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | US20020369502P | 02.04.2002 Original published format: US 369502 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350701 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1350701 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350701 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/08 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B60S9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Stützbein und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau | [2003/41] | English: | Landing gear and method of assembly | [2003/41] | French: | Béquille de stationnement et méthode pour son assemblage | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08151090.1 / EP1914133 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 07.05.2008 | |
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0513973 (JOST INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 22 * * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 46; figures 1-4,1a,1b,2a,4a *; | [Y]DE19616704 (HAACON HEBETECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1* figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US4187733 |