EP1464549 - Improvements in or relating to an air-bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG 447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moore, Johnathan 18 Rosemary Lane, Rowledge Farnham, Surrey GU10 4DD / GB | 02 /
Green, Christopher 46 Pwllswyddog, Tregaron Ceredigion, SY25 6JG / GB | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03252170.0 | 04.04.2003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464549 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B60R21/232 (EP);
B60R21/213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in oder bezüglich eines Airbags | [2004/41] | English: | Improvements in or relating to an air-bag | [2004/41] | French: | Améliorations de ou concernant un sac gonflable | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001019201 (MASUDA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 40 - paragraph 41 * * figures 2E,2H,2L,2M * [Y] 4; | [XAY]GB2367535 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,2,7,9-11 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph L * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5 [Y] 4; | [XA]GB2367536 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * figure 2 *[A] 4; | [XA]EP1279568 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * abstract * * column 11, line 31 - column 12, line 4 * * figures 9,10 * [A] 8,10 |