EP1355054 - Fuel Control System for a gas turbine engine having overthrust control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Control Systems Limited c/o Ernst & Young 400 Capability Green Luton Bedfordshire LU1 3LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Goodrich Control Systems Limited c/o Ernst & Young 400 Capability Green Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 3LU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elliot, Philip Laurence 20 Lewis Road Stirchley, Birmingham B30 2SX / GB | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252385.4 | 15.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | GB20020008645 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0208645 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355054 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/28, F02C9/46, F02D9/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
F02C9/28 (EP);
F02C9/263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftstoffregelsystem für Gasturbinen mit Schubüberschussverhinderung | [2003/43] | English: | Fuel Control System for a gas turbine engine having overthrust control | [2003/43] | French: | Système de régulation de carburant pour une turbine à gaz avec protection contre surpoussée | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |