EP1359731 - Replaceable personal digital assistant cradle for a telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Knowledge Corporation 350 Legget Drive, P.O. Box 13089 Kanata Ontario K2K 2W7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Mitel Knowledge Corporation 350 Legget Drive, P.O. Box 13089 Kanata, Ontario K2K 2W7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Templin, Robert Charles 13 Black Rivers Place Ottawa, Ontario K2M 2E2 / CA | 02 /
Kemp, Toby John 345 Cunningham Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1H 6S2 / CA | 03 /
Mahan, John 19 Panandrick Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2W 1A5 / CA | 04 /
Ahrendorff, Anders 12 Broadway Ottawa, Ontario K1S 2V6 / CA | [2005/22] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
Templin, Robert Charles 13 Black Rivers Place Ottawa, Ontario K2M 2E2 / CA | ||
02 /
Kemp, Toby John 345 Cunningham Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1H 6S2 / CA | |||
03 /
Mahan, John 19 Panadrick Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2W 1A5 / CA | |||
04 /
Ahrendorff, Anders 12 Broadway Ottawa, Ontario K1S 2V6 / CA | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252407.6 | 15.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | GB20020010308 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: GB 0210308 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359731 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359731 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/06, G06F1/16 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H04M1/04 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
H04M1/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/724092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernsprechstelle mit einer abnehmbaren Auflage für einen persönlichen Hilfsrechner (PDA) | [2003/45] | English: | Replaceable personal digital assistant cradle for a telephone | [2003/45] | French: | Téléphone muni d'un berceau de support amovible pour un assistant numérique personnel (PDA) | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 06.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5157723 (MCLEAN KENNETH W [CA]) [A] 3-5,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5675524 (BERNARD MARC ALLEN [US]) [A] 1,2,6-9,13-15* figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2328344 (INVENTEC CORP [TW]) [A] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6266539 (PARDO TEDDY [IL]) [A] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * column 4, line 45 - line 55 * * column 5, line 19 - line 38; figure 1 * * column 8, line 47 - line 50 * * figures 10A,10B,11A,11B; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0235806 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * the whole document * |