EP1367116 - Lubricating compositions for wet-brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | For all designated states Chevron Oronite S.A. 79 Rue Anatole France 92309 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | ||
For all designated states Chevron Oronite S.A. 79 Rue Anatole France 92309 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | ||
For all designated states Chevron Oronite S.A. 79 Rue Anatole France 92309 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lantuejoul, Karine 13 Rue des 104 76700 Harfleur / FR | 02 /
McLeod, Kenneth L. 4111 Fawnridge San Antonio, Texas 78229 / US | 03 /
Vartanian, Paul F. 1072 Mandana Boulevard Oakland, California 94610 / US | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252425.8 | 16.04.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | US20020155707 | 22.05.2002 Original published format: US 155707 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367116 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367116 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/06 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C10M141/06 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10N2030/76 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | C10M141/06, // (C10M141/06, 129:74, 129:76, 133:16),(C10N30/06, 40:04) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/35] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen für nasse Bremsen | [2003/49] | English: | Lubricating compositions for wet-brakes | [2003/49] | French: | Compositions d'huile lubrifiante pour freins à disque humide | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2010 | 12.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184167.4 / EP2333035 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Request for further processing for: | 09.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5064546 (DASAI MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]WO9202602 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]EP0747464 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 8, line 29 - page 11, line 54 * * page 26, line 25 - line 42 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0799883 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-23 * page 4, line 42 - page 5, line 7 * * examples 1,4; tables 1-1 * * example 1; tables 1,2 *; | [X]US5851962 (KAGA KUNIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-25 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 28 * * example - * |