EP1361364 - Multi-rotor screw compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holden, Steven James 4927 Yeaworth Lane Manilius, New York 13104 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Adrian James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Samuels, Adrian James Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252456.3 | 17.04.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | US20020142679 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: US 142679 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1361364 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1361364 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361364 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/16 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
F04C29/12 (EP,US);
F04C18/16 (KR);
F04C18/165 (EP,US);
F04C29/042 (EP,US);
F04C29/122 (EP,US);
F04C2250/10 (EP,US);
F04C28/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/01] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraubenrotorverdichter mit mehreren Rotoren | [2003/46] | English: | Multi-rotor screw compressor | [2003/46] | French: | Compresseur hélicoidal à plusieurs rotors | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 15.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06017424.0 / EP1722105 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 25.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2481527 (ROBERT NILSSON HANS) [A] 2,4,5 * figures 1,2,3A,5A * * column 4, line 10 - line 29 *; | [A]GB1576230 (AERZENER MASCHF GMBH) [A] 1,3,5* the whole document *; | [XA]US5775117 (SHAW DAVID N [US]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,4 * * column 1, line 45 - line 51 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 25 * [A] 2,4,5; | [A]EP1087185 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 28 - line 42 * |