EP1355237 - Apparatus and method for generating data useful in indexing and searching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Factiva, Inc. US Route One at Ridge Road, Building 5 Monmouth Junction NJ 08852 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Dow Jones Reuters Business Interactive, LLC P.O. Box 300 Princeton, NJ 08543-0300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snyder, James D. 16 Center Street Hopewell, New Jersey 08525-1703 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252510.7 | 22.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | US20020374003P | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 374003 P | US20030417548 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 417548 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355237 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1355237 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, // G06F17/30 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G06F40/284 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99936 (US)
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | G06F17/27, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Erstellung von Daten, die beim Indexieren und Suchen nützlich sind | [2003/43] | English: | Apparatus and method for generating data useful in indexing and searching | [2003/43] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de generation des données utilisables pour l'indexation et la recherche | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6243713 (NELSON PAUL E [US], et al) [X] 1,4-15,17-21,23-26 * abstract * * column 9, line 54 - column 11, line 31; figures 6,7a-d * * column 16, lines 6-23 * * column 26, line 49 - column 27, line 1 *; | [X]US6327561 (SMITH MARIA E [US], et al) [X] 1,21 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 18 ** column 4, lines 34-67; figure 3 * | by applicant | US6243713 |