Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
06.08.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
15.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
15.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
11.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
27.02.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.02.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
27.02.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
30.01.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
19.09.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |