EP1359455 - Micro-mirror device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Timothy L. 4369 NW Jon Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Radominski, George 6775 NW Diamond Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Norman L. 1170 NW Country Hills Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 04 /
McMahon, Terry E. 631 NW 10th Street Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 05 /
Schulte, Donald W. 2215 NW Kings Boulevard Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 06 /
Donaldson, Jeremy H. 1723 SW Otana Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | 07 /
Rosi, Leonard A. 24230 Evergreen Road Philomath, OR 97370 / US | 08 /
Bengali, Sadiq S. 2951 NW 13th Street Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252590.9 | 24.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020136719 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 136719 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359455 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359455 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359455 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, B81B3/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B81B7/04 (EP,US);
G02B26/08 (KR);
G02B26/004 (EP,US);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
B81B2201/042 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Mikrospiegel-Vorrichtung | [2003/45] | English: | Micro-mirror device | [2003/45] | French: | Dispositif à micro-miroir | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CY | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4359698 (LAMBE JOHN J, et al) [X] 1-4,6,15,17,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 3, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0916984 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,14,15,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0030] - [0032] - [0038] - [0056] - [0066] , [0067] * * figures 4,8,10,11 *; | [A]WO0210836 (HOLL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0024] , [0025] ** figures 2,3,5,13-15 * |