Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4371403B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B2 | JP2004000585 | 08.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US6348502 | 29.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1358848 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2004 | A3 | EP1358848 | 05.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6348502 | 29.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6529575 | 04.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US6348502 | 29.04.2002 |