EP1378220 - Stretcher retention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferno (UK) Limited Ferno House, Stubs Beck Lane Cleckheaton West Yorkshire BD19 4TZ / GB | [2008/42] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Ferno (UK) Limited Ferno House, Stubs Beck Lane Cleckheaton, West Yorkshire BD19 4TZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saleem, Shahid Ferno UK Limited, Ferno House, Stubs Beck Lane Cleckheaton, West Yorkshire BD19 4TZ / GB | 02 /
Williamson, Robert Ferno UK Limited, Ferno House, Stubs Beck Lane Cleckheaton, West Yorkshire BD19 4TZ / GB | 03 /
Whyman, David Paul Ferno UK Limited, Ferno House, Stubs Beck Lane Cleckheaton, West Yorkshire BD19 4TZ / GB | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY, West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252730.1 | 30.04.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | GB20020014812 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0214812 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378220 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378220 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61G1/06, A61G3/08 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A61G1/0293 (EP);
A61G1/0212 (EP);
A61G3/0816 (EP);
A61G3/0833 (EP);
A61G3/0883 (EP);
A61G3/0891 (EP);
A61G1/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Halterung für Krankentrage | [2004/02] | English: | Stretcher retention | [2004/02] | French: | Rétention de brancard | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.04.2008 | 15.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | IE | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | LU | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2203999 (MACCLESFIELD MOTOR BODIES) [X] 1,3,4 * page 3 - page 5; figure 2 *; | [X]US5092722 (REAZER III GEORGE M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 4 - column 8; figure 5 *; | [X]US5205601 (FERRIS KENNETH R [AU]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5494386 (PAULL MICHAEL J [AU]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 48 - column 7, line 14; figures 1-3,8 *; | [X]EP0821927 (FERNO TRANSPORTGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 5, line 21 - column 8, line 1; figures 1,5 *; | [X]US5779296 (HEWKO BARRY J [CA]) [X] 1,3,9,10 * column 6, line 65 - column 10, line 25; figures 8-11,13-15 *; | [A]US5913559 (SEXTON GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO0234192 (STRYKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |