EP1364723 - Method and device for uninterrupted continous rolling of bar and rod products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/48] | Uninterrupted continous rolling of bar & rod products | ||
[2005/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORGAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY 15 Belmont Street Worcester Massachusetts 01605 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states MORGAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY 15 Belmont Street Worcester Massachusetts 01605 / US | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states MORGAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY 15 Belmont Street Worcester Massachusetts 01605 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shore, T. Michael 185 Mountain Road Princeton, MA 01541 / US | 02 /
Puchovski, Melicher 49 Saw Mill Road Dudley, MA 01571 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252791.3 | 02.05.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | US20020378757P | 08.05.2002 Original published format: US 378757 P | US20030424503 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 424503 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1364723 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1364723 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364723 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/18 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B21B1/18 (EP,US);
B23K31/02 (KR);
B21B15/0085 (EP,US);
B21B39/006 (EP,US);
B21B39/18 (EP,US);
B21B41/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum ununterbrochenen kontinuierlichen Walzen von Stab- und Stangen- Produkten | [2005/06] | English: | Method and device for uninterrupted continous rolling of bar and rod products | [2005/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le laminage en continue sans interruption des barres et des tiges | [2005/06] |
Former [2003/48] | Ununterbrochenes kontinuierliches Walzen von Stab- und Stangen- Produkten | ||
Former [2003/48] | Uninterrupted continous rolling of bar & rod products | ||
Former [2003/48] | Laminage en continue sans interruption des barres et des tiges | Examination procedure | 15.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2005 | Observations by third parties | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | CZ | 26.10.2005 | EE | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | RO | 26.10.2005 | SI | 26.10.2005 | SK | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | BG | 26.01.2006 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | HU | 27.04.2006 | IE | 02.05.2006 | LU | 02.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 02.05.2006 | ||
LU | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4323837 (BUEDENDENDER GUENTHER DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 49; figure 4 *; | [A]US5767475 (TAKASHIMA KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1A-1C *; | [A]US2001015367 (MATSUO GIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* figure 1; claims 1,6,7 * | other | US3451123 | US6216515 |