EP1367222 - Method and apparatus for reducing turbine blade tip region temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keith, Sean Robert 5592 Kingsbury Road Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 02 /
Staker, John Robert 5005 Hurlingham Way Cincinnati, Ohio 45244 / US | 03 /
Tressler, Judd Dodge 3743 Windyhollow Way Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
DeMarche, Thomas Edward 173 Herrick Road Boxford, Massachusetts 01921 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2003/49] | 01 /
Keith, Sean Robert 5592 Kingsbury Road Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | ||
02 /
Staker, John Robert 5005 Hurlingham Way Cincinnati, Ohio 45244 / US | |||
03 /
Tressler, Judd Dodge 3743 Windyhollow Way Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | |||
04 /
DeMarche, Thomas Edward 173 Herrick Road Boxford, Massachussets 01921 / US | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2003/49] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253242.6 | 23.05.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | US20020160527 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 160527 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367222 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1367222 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D5/20 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49341 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | F01D5/20, F01D5/18, F01D5/20 | ||
Former IPC [2003/49] | F01D5/14, F01D5/18, F01D5/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/18] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der Temperaturen an Schaufelspitzenbereichen | [2013/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for reducing turbine blade tip region temperatures | [2003/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de réduction des températures dans la région des extrémités d'aubes | [2013/13] |
Former [2003/49] | Methode und Einrichtung zur Verminderung der Temperatur von Schaufelblattspitzen | ||
Former [2003/49] | Méthode et dispositif de réduction de la température des extrémités des aubes | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5261789 (BUTTS DON [US], et al) [X] 1-10* figure 2 * | Examination | US3635585 | US3885609 | US4606701 | US5464479 | US5564902 |