Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |
03.11.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.10.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |