EP1482373 - Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253419.0 | 30.05.2003 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482373 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00, G03F7/20 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G03F7/70291 (EP,KR,US);
G03F9/7088 (KR);
G03B27/53 (KR,US);
G03F7/70216 (KR);
G03F7/70716 (KR);
G03F7/70791 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Artikels | [2004/49] | English: | Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method | [2004/49] | French: | Appareil lithographique et méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2005/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6133986 (JOHNSON KENNETH C [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * figure 2; claims 1,7,21,27,29 *; | [X]US2001045690 (BRANDINGER JAY J [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10* paragraph [0045]; claims 16,17 *; | [X]US2002024714 (SANDSTROM TORBJORN [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraphs [0074] - [0113]; figure 6; claims 1-3,6-10,20,25,28-30,36,39 * |