EP1394736 - Data processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Sony United Kingdom Limited The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tapson, Daniel Warren 31 Pemroke Road Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8QH / GB | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr., et al D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253663.3 | 10.06.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020215513 | 04.07.2002 Original published format: US 215513 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1394736 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1394736 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/32154 (EP,US);
G06T1/005 (EP,US);
H04N1/32165 (EP,US);
H04N1/3217 (EP,US);
H04N1/32277 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0052 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0063 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0065 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/34] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsgerät und -verfahren | [2004/10] | English: | Data processing apparatus and method | [2004/10] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traitement de données | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5664018 (LEIGHTON FRANK THOMSON [US]) [DA] 1-16* column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 42 *; | [Y] - DELANNAY D ET AL, "Compensation of geometrical deformations for watermark extraction in the digital cinema application", PROC. OF THE SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20010122), vol. 4314, pages 149 - 157, XP002960804 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 153, paragraph 1 * * page 154, paragraph 1 * * page 157, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.435395 | [Y] - THEVENAZ P ET AL, "ITERATIVE MULTI-SCALE REGISTRATION WITHOUT LANDMARKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP). WASHINGTON, OCT. 23 - 26, 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19951023), VOL. 3, pages 228 - 231, XP000623141 [Y] 1-16 * page 228, column L, paragraph L * * page 228, column R, paragraph 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1995.537622 | [Y] - COX I J ET AL, "SECURE SPREAD SPECTRUM WATERMARKING FOR MULTIMEDIA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199712), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 1673 - 1687, XP011026243 [Y] 1,11,14 * page 1677, column L, paragraphs 2-5; figures 2,3,6 * * page 1678, column L, paragraph 5 * * page 1684, column L, paragraph L * | [Y] - CHUNG-LIN HUANG ET AL, "A multi-resolution image registration method for multimedia application", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1998 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MONTEREY, CA, USA, IEEE, US, (19980531), vol. 3, pages 13 - 16, XP010289318 [Y] 1,11,14 * page 13, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1998.703880 | by applicant | US5664018 | GB2383220 | GB2383221 | GB2383148 | GB2385218 | - DELANNAY D ET AL., "Compensation of geometrical deformations for watermark extraction in the digital cinema application", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, (20010122), vol. 4314, doi:doi:10.1117/12.435395, pages 149 - 157, XP002960804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.435395 | - THEVENAZ P ET AL., "Iterative multi-scale registration without landmarks", IEEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19951023), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/ICIP.1995.537622, pages 228 - 231, XP000623141 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1995.537622 |