EP1372191 - Method for depositing a device feature on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Filtronic Compound Semiconductor Limited Heighington Lane Business Park Newton Ayecliffe Co. Durham, DL5 6JW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Filtronic Compound Semiconductor Limited Heighington Lane Business Park Newton Ayecliffe, Co. Durham, DL5 6JW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, Carl Christopher, Filtronic Compound Semiconductors Ltd, Heighington Lane Business Park Newton Aycliffe, Co. Durham DL5 6JW / GB | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | McDonough, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | McDonough, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253753.2 | 12.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | GB20020013695 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0213695 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372191 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1372191 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, H01L21/308, G03F7/38 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/7688 (EP,US);
G03F7/168 (EP,US);
G03F7/38 (EP,US);
H01L21/0272 (EP,US);
H01L21/0274 (EP,US);
H01L21/76838 (EP,US);
G03F7/095 (EP,US);
H01L21/28587 (EP,US);
H05K3/048 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | H01L21/768, H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/01] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abscheidung einer Struktur auf einem Substrat | [2003/51] | English: | Method for depositing a device feature on a substrate | [2003/51] | French: | Technique de dépot d'une structure sur un substrat | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03235322 ; | [X]JPS57199222 ; | [X]JPH1197328 ; | [A]JPH03119720 ; | [X]US6372414 (REDD RANDY D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, lines 12-28 *; | [X] - REDD ET AL., "Lithographic Process for High-Resolution Metal Lift-Off", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN RESIST TECHNOLOGY AND PROCESSING XVI - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, Santa Clara, California, (19990315), vol. 3678, pages 641 - 651, XP008027240 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 641 - page 643 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.350188 | [X] - REDD ET AL., "Revitalization of Single Layer Lift-off For Finer Resolution and Challenging Topography", GAAS MANTECH CONFERENCE - DIGEST OF PAPERS PROCEEDINGS OF 2001 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR TECHNOLOGY, Las Vegas, (20010521), pages 99 - 101, XP001188108 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Single Layer Optical Lift Off Process. October 1975.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19751001), vol. 18, no. 5, page 1395, XP002269032 [X] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920114), vol. 016, no. 014, Database accession no. (E - 1154), & JP03235322 A 19911021 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830225), vol. 007, no. 049, Database accession no. (E - 161), & JP57199222 A 19821207 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11097328 A 19990409 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Single Layer Lift-Off Process. September 1979.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19790901), vol. 22, no. 4, page 1399, XP002269033 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910816), vol. 015, no. 323, Database accession no. (E - 1101), & JP03119720 A 19910522 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |