Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004037999 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0213695 | 14.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1372191 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2004 | A3 | EP1372191 | 17.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0213695 | 14.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0213695D0 | 24.07.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0213695 | 14.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2392009 | 18.02.2004 | A | GB0313560D0 | 16.07.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0213695 | 14.06.2002 |