EP1377039 - Compound eye image pickup apparatus and electronic apparatus equipped therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Takashi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/05] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253908.2 | 20.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP20020182934 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002182934 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377039 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1377039 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N3/15, G02B3/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04N25/41 (EP,US);
H04N25/61 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | H04N5/225, G02B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/23] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Facettenauge-Bildaufnahmegerät und damit versehene elektronische Vorrichtung | [2004/01] | English: | Compound eye image pickup apparatus and electronic apparatus equipped therewith | [2004/01] | French: | Appareil de prise de vue du type oeil à facettes et dispositif electronique équipé de celui-ci | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/34] | 10.07.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2007 | 10.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000196939 ; | [X]EP0893915 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [X]US6002743 (TELYMONDE TIMOTHY D [US]); | [A]US2002075450 (ARATANI MICHIHARU [JP], et al); | [L]US6747702 (HARRIGAN MICHAEL E [US]) |