EP1381221 - Image sensing apparatus and method, program, and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/03] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-20-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Kenji c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2014/03] |
Former [2004/03] | 01 /
Takahashi, Kenji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/25] |
Former [2008/31] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254147.6 | 30.06.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020195787 | 04.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002195787 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381221 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1381221 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381221 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H04N1/6086 (EP,US);
H04N1/6077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und Verfahren, Programm und Speichermedium | [2004/03] | English: | Image sensing apparatus and method, program, and storage medium | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vues et procédé, logiciel et support d'enregistrement | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.08.2014 | GB | 18.09.2014 | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/25] | FR | 18.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5198890 (SUGA AKIRA [JP]); | [X]US5202756 (SASAKI TAKASHI [US], et al); | [A]EP0891077 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]EP1139653 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | Examination | US5420630 | by applicant | US5202756 |