EP1393684 - A device for withdrawing or injecting a fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Spine, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2004/34] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states DePuy AcroMed, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morawski, Lina 131 North Washington Street, no. 3 Norton, Massachusetts 02766 / US | 02 /
Voellmicke, John C. 2970 Mendon Road, no. 172 Cumberland, Rhode Island 02864 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Orr, Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254181.5 | 01.07.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020194752 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 194752 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1393684 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1393684 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
A61B10/025 (EP,US);
A61B10/00 (KR);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B17/3472 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen und/oder Entnehmen von Flüssigkeiten | [2004/10] | English: | A device for withdrawing or injecting a fluid | [2004/10] | French: | Dispositif d'injection et/ou de prélèvement de liquides | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3822701 (CLOYD H) [A] 1-26 * column W *; | [AD]GB2130890 (DOWNS SURGICAL PLC) [AD] 1-26 * page 3, line 89 - page 4, line 21; figures 4,5 *; | [AD]US4969870 (KRAMER GEORGE C [US], et al) [AD] 1-26 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5331972 (WADHWANI SURESH [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 36; figure - *; | [A]US6080115 (RUBINSTEIN ALAN I [US]) [A] 1-26* column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 57; figure - * |