EP1380283 - Cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2011/12] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Noriyuki Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254406.6 | 11.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020202145 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002202145 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380283 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380283 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/46, A61K8/42, A61K8/45, A61K8/86, A61Q19/00, A61K8/894 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (KR);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/45 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [2004/03] | English: | Cosmetic composition | [2004/03] | French: | Composition cosmétique | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 21.07.2004 | Observations by third parties | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2011
08.08.2012
WITHDRAWN Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2011
Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | 27.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 05.11.2012 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0267707 (KAM SCIENT INC [CA]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, lines 5-44 ** example 2 *; | [A]US6417145 (DECOSTER SANDRINE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, lines 15-24 * * column 10, lines 19-23 * * example - * * claims 1,4,5,22-24 * | Examination | GB2217342 | US6190645 | US2002028187 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Westbourne, UK, (20011101), no. 451030 | other | - "USE OF BENZOTRIAZOLE UV-ABSORBERS FOR THE PROTECTION OF HAIR-PART II: EXAMPLE FORMULATIONS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (2001), vol. 451, no. 30, pages 1839 - 1845, XP007129210 | - "Specification of CD and SD Alcohol Denat. By Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco, and Firearms", SCIENTIFIC LITERATURE REVIEW, WASHINGTON, (20030430), pages 1,3 - 5, XP002989925 | - "Material Safety Data sheet - Oleth 20", RITA CORPORATION RITOLETH 20 M.S.D.S, WOODSTOCK IL. U.S.A, pages 1 - 2, XP002989926 |