EP1384858 - Internal cooling of the case of a low pressure turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Jr., Henry Calvin 6036 Glen Trace Lane West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
Thompson, James Edward 6727 Eldorado Drive Middletown, Ohio 45044 / US | 03 /
Hildebrand, Kurt Thomas 2785 Whitehouse Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45244 / US | 04 /
Zegarski, Frederick J. 7222 Willowood Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 05 /
Bosel, Tod Kenneth 801 Weymouth Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/05] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254492.6 | 18.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | US20020206601 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: US 206601 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1384858 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1384858 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/14, F01D25/24, F01D9/04, F02C7/18 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
F01D25/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | F01D25/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/25] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlung der Innenwand eines Niederdruck-Gasturbinengehäuses | [2004/05] | English: | Internal cooling of the case of a low pressure turbine | [2004/05] | French: | Refroidissement de la surface intérieure de l'enveloppe de stateur dans la section basse pression d'une turbine à gaz | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2910269 (LIONEL HAWORTH, et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 2, line 19 - line 66 * * column 3, line 6 - line 17 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4512712 (BARAN JR WALTER J [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 2 ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0545589 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 23 * * column 6, line 4 - line 20 *; | [X]RU2151886 (AVIADVIGATEL AOOT) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * |