EP1382261 - Refrigerated extended shelf-life bread products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Holdings, Inc. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tangprasertchai, Uraiwan 1020 Ridgeview Drive Inverness, Illinois 60010 / US | 02 /
Forneck, Keith Daniel 534 Ascot Streamwood, Illinois 60107 / US | 03 /
Hill, Laura Gail 208 Pine Street Prospect Heights, Illinois 60070 / US | 04 /
Apel, Lisa 1140 Maple Avenue No. 2 Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US | 05 /
Dewalt, John 16642 South Kenwood Illinois 60473 / US | 06 /
Richards, David Carl 628 Ash Street Hobart, Indiana 46342 / US | 07 /
Das, Dhruba Jyoti 2027 Westfield Drive Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 08 /
Morales, Lynell 2119 N. Campbell Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60647 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/04] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254514.7 | 18.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US20020198562 | 18.07.2002 Original published format: US 198562 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382261 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382261 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A21D15/02, A21D13/00, A21D10/02, B65B25/16, B65D77/04 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
B65D81/2084 (EP,US);
A21D10/02 (EP,US);
A21D13/32 (EP,US);
A21D15/02 (EP,US);
B65D77/0413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | Gekühlte Backwaren mit langer Lagerbeständigkeit | [2004/04] | English: | Refrigerated extended shelf-life bread products | [2004/04] | French: | Produits de boulangerie réfrigérés ayant une durée de vie prolongée | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2007 | CZ | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | EE | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | FR | 11.04.2007 | RO | 11.04.2007 | SI | 11.04.2007 | SK | 11.04.2007 | TR | 11.04.2007 | BG | 11.07.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | LU | 18.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | HU | 12.10.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
LU | 18.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 07.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 07.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 11.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0776605 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [A] 15-18 * column 2, lines 48-57 * * column 3, lines 24-33 * * column 6, lines 8,9 * * claims 1,3-5,8 * * figure 2 *; | [DY]EP0818399 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [DY] 5,11 * page 2, lines 31-44 * * page 4, lines 18-24,40-44 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-5,7,9 *; | [A]WO9818332 (WORKMAN PACKAGING INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14 * * claims 1-3,9-16 *; | [Y]EP1053682 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 46 - page 3, line 9 * * page 3, lines 34-41 * * page 4, lines 29-35 * * page 5, line 46 - page 6, line 19 * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP1053681 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12,13,15-18 * page 2, lines 44-56 * * page 2, lines 25,26 * * page 4, lines 27-33 * * page 5, lines 1-29 * * example 1 * * claims 1-3,5,11,12,15-17 *; | [Y]US2002071895 (KASHOU JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 14,19 * page 1, paragraphs 2,4,5 *; | [DPX]US2002136814 (FORNECK KEITH [US], et al) [DPX] 1,2,8,9,15-18 * column 2, paragraphs 2-4 * * column 3, paragraph 3 ** claims 1,9,15-18 * |