EP1389639 - Steel sheet with excellent bendability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2011/01] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Shushi, c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
Makii, Koichi, c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
Akamizu, Hiroshi, c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2004/08] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254606.1 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/08] | Priority number, date | JP20020219662 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002219662 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389639 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1389639 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389639 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C21D8/0273 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C21D1/185 (EP,US);
C21D1/20 (EP,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,US);
C21D2211/003 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, FR, GB [2006/09] |
Former [2004/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stahlblech mit guter Biegbarkeit | [2004/08] | English: | Steel sheet with excellent bendability | [2004/08] | French: | Tôle d'acier présentant une excellente aptitude au pliage | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2011
11.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2011
ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 11.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/21] | 06.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.01.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.01.2011 | [2015/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11189839 ; | [X]JP2000256789 ; | [A]JPH11323489 ; | [A]JP2001152287 ; | [A]JPH1143740 ; | [A]EP0586704 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-20 * * tables 1-10 *; | [X]EP0707087 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-11 * * tables 1,2 * * page 8, line 40 - page 10, line 8 *; | [X]EP0922782 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-7 * * page 6, column 21 - page 7, column 24 * * tables 1-3 *; | [X]EP0974677 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-13 * * tables 1-8 * * page 11, line 46 - page 13, line 27 *; | [X]EP1201780 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-14 * * examples 1,2; tables 1-4 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 17 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 30 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11189839 A 19990713 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000256789 A 20000919 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11323489 A 19991126 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001152287 A 20010605 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11043740 A 19990216 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - SPIEKERMANN P, "LEGIERUNGEN - EIN BESONDERES PATENTRECHTLICHES PROBLEM? - LEGIERUNGSPRUEFUNG IM EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMT -", MITTEILUNGEN DER DEUTSCHEN PATENTANWAELTE, HEYMANN, KOLN,, DE, (1993), ISSN 0026-6884, pages 178 - 190, XP000961882 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |