EP1394948 - Synchronised sinusoidal signal controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, 1-chome, Kitaotsuka, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, 1-chome, Kitaotsuka, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okui, Yoshiaki c/o Sanyo Denki Co, Ltd. 15-1, Kitaotsuka 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254714.3 | 28.07.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | JP20020221472 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002221472 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1394948 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1394948 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394948 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/07, H03L7/14, H03L7/087 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H03L7/0992 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (EP,US);
H03L7/087 (EP,US);
H03L7/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/05] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regler für synchronisierte sinusförmige Signale | [2004/10] | English: | Synchronised sinusoidal signal controller | [2004/10] | French: | Contrôlleur synchronisé pour signal sinusoidal | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 13.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06075804.2 / EP1696570 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/32] | deleted | ||
Former [2008/23] | FR | 31.07.2006 | |
Former [2007/48] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/45] | DE | 01.02.2007 | |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 14.06.2006 | |
DE | 01.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH10323053 ; | [A]JPH07283731 ; | [A]EP0115326 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 2,3,5-7,9-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0479237 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0652642 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6147530 (NOGAWA HIROMICHI [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10323053 A 19981204 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [YD] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07283731 A 19951027 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |