EP1394422 - Screw and fastening system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levey, Kenneth R. 943 Wild Ginger Trail West Chicago, IL 60185 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Lawrence W. 23460 Kensington Taylor, MI 48180 / US | 03 /
Fischer, John D. 5157 Gallagher Whitmore Lake, MO 48189 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254768.9 | 30.07.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020402772P | 12.08.2002 Original published format: US 402772 P | US20030600195 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: US 600195 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394422 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394422 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/30 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
F16B33/02 (EP,US);
F16B39/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/48] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraube und Besfestigungsvorrichtung | [2004/10] | English: | Screw and fastening system | [2004/10] | French: | Vis et système de fixation | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2046862 (LAMSON & SESSIONS CO) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 13 - line 16 * * page 2, line 34 - line 85 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0071844 (BURDSALL & WARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 5 * * figures 1-3,7-9,11 *; | [X]EP0133773 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, line 3 - line 34 * * figure - *; | [A]DE4437798 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 9,10 * column 3, line 16 - line 34 ** figure - *; | [XA]DE19920616 (BAUER ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 64 * * figure - * [A] 9,10 |