EP1386544 - Method and apparatus for browning and cooking food products with superheated steam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pyramid Food Processing Equipment Manufacturing Inc. 152 Lorum ST, Tewksbury Massachusetts 01876 / US | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holm, Mark E. 117 Kingswood Ct Cherry Hill, NJ 08034 / US | 02 /
Poissant, John V. 467 High Street, Unit 25 Hampton, NJ 03842 / US | 03 /
Souza, Kevin M. 35 Mill Street, Extension Amesbury, MA 01913 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254822.4 | 01.08.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | US20020400121P | 01.08.2002 Original published format: US 400121 P | US20020401097P | 05.08.2002 Original published format: US 401097 P | US20030349324 | 23.01.2003 Original published format: US 349324 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386544 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/01, A47J27/16 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
A47J27/16 (EP,US);
A23L5/13 (EP,US);
A23L5/15 (EP,US);
A23L5/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/44] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bräunen und Garen Nahrungsmittels unter Verwendung von überhitztem Dampf | [2004/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for browning and cooking food products with superheated steam | [2004/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour faire rissoler et cuire des aliments utilisant de la vapeur surchauffée | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/17] | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03262469 ; | [XA]JP2000152754 ; | [A]JP2000139366 ; | [A]US4556572 (KAUFMAN JR HAROLD B [US], et al) [A] * column 4, line 10 - column 15, line 25; figure - *; | [X]US4701340 (BRATTON RONALD E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,18-21,25,29,32-34,42-44,46,47,49-52,54,57-60,62,64,67-69 * column 6, line 38 - column 11, line 2; figure - *; | [XY]FR2663721 (ESSER HANS PETER [DE]) [X] 1,3-15,19-29,33,34,42,44-54,58-64,68,69 * page 7, line 22 - page 11, line 2 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 4; figure - * [Y] 2,16-18,30-32,35-41,43,55-57,65-67,70-75; | [XY]EP0482709 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-7,10-21,25,29-34,42-47,49-60,62,64-69 * column 7, lines 46-55 * * column 8, lines 39-44 * * column 9, lines 19-22; figures 3-6; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,18,32,35-38,41,43,57,67,70,71,74,75; | [X]US5505975 (TAYLOR ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,3-6,10,12,15,19-21,25,29,33,34,42,44,46,47,49,51,52,54,58-60,62,64,68,69 * column 2, line 61 - column 5, line 46 * * column 7, lines 1-46; figure . *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 066, Database accession no. (C - 0912), & JP03262469 A 19911122 (KYOZO TOMITA) [Y] 16,17,30,31,39,40,55,56,65,66,72,73 * abstract * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 55, Database accession no. 2000-581368, XP002257250 & JP2000152754 A 20000606 (SHISHIDO H) [X] 1,10,21,22,25,26,42,47-49,61-63 * abstract * [A] 35,70 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000139366 A 20000523 (SHISHIDO HIROSHI) [A] 6,22,26,35,48,61,63,70 * abstract * |