blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1387509

EP1387509 - Optical transmission system and optical amplification method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2013  [2013/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2012/22]
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Ryu, @NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minatu-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
 [2012/22]
Former [2004/06]01 / Yokoyama, Ryu, NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minatu-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/15]MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2004/06]Moir, Michael Christopher, et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date03254850.504.08.2003
[2004/06]
Priority number, dateJP2002022615002.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002226150
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1387509
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1387509
Date:17.08.2005
[2005/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1387509
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04B10/17, H01S3/30
[2011/46]
CPC:
H01S3/302 (EP,US); H04B10/298 (EP,US); H04B10/2916 (EP,US);
H01S3/09408 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/33]H04B10/17, H04B10/08
Former IPC [2004/06]H04B10/17
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2006/19]
Former [2004/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optisches Übertragungssystem und Verfahren zur optischen Verstärkung[2004/06]
English:Optical transmission system and optical amplification method[2004/06]
French:Système de transmission optique et méthode d'amplification optique[2004/06]
Examination procedure01.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/13]
30.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2012Fee for grant paid
04.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2011
Opposition(s)01.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
26.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0585005  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 51 - line 56 * * column 2, line 13 - line 36 * * column 4, line 3 - line 28 * * column 5, line 16 - line 19 * * column 5, line 43 - line 56 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 9 *;
 [Y]US5883736  (OSHIMA ISAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 62 - line 65 * * column 2, line 43 - line 46 * * column 4, line 33 - line 38 * * column 4, line 46 - line 58 * * column 5, line 9 - line 31 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1143645  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 14 - line 25 * * column 2, line 32 - line 40 * * column 3, line 1 - line 19 * * column 12, line 45 - line 54 ** figures 7,11,13 *
by applicantEP0585005
 US5883736
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.