EP1464600 - Multi-positional rotatable/large substrate backstop guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marasco, Joseph 30 Norbrook Road Fairport NY 14450 / US | 02 /
Milillo, William D. 2011 Paddy Lane Ontario NY 14519 / US | 03 /
Miller, Eugene F. 77 Brentwood Lane Fairport NY 14450 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254853.9 | 04.08.2003 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20020213746 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: US 213746 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464600 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464600 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464600 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/04 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B65H1/04 (EP,US);
B65H2301/331 (EP,US);
B65H2405/114 (EP,US);
B65H2511/10 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/10, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/37] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrstellige drehbare Hintenanschlagsführung für grosse Substrate | [2004/41] | English: | Multi-positional rotatable/large substrate backstop guide | [2004/41] | French: | Butée de guidage arrière rotative à positions multiples pour des grands substrats | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000034022 ; | [X]JP2000034024 ; | [X]JP2002128287 ; | [X]JP3297738 ; | [X]GB1412759 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US5236187 (MIZUTANI NAOKI [JP]) [X] 1* figure - *; | [A]US5651540 (WATANABE YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 7 - line 37; figure 4 *; | [X]US5895041 (NISHIMURA MINORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 33; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000034022 A 20000202 (CANON INC) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000034024 A 20000202 (CANON INC) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002128287 A 20020509 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920407), vol. 0161, no. 37, Database accession no. (M - 1231), & JP3297738 A 19911227 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |