EP1394126 - Apparatus and method for recovery and recycle of coolant gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shedletsky, Igor 30 Mulberry Circle Staten Island NY 10314 / US | 02 /
Micke, André 777 Springfield Avenue Apt. 6 Summit NJ 07901 / US | 03 /
Lu, Yaping 261 Country Club Lane Scotch Plains NJ 07076 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03254906.5 | 06.08.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020229594 | 28.08.2002 Original published format: US 229594 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394126 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/027 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
C03B37/02718 (EP,US);
C03B37/03 (KR);
C03B2205/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Methode zur Rückgewinnung und Rezyklierung von Kühlgas | [2004/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for recovery and recycle of coolant gas | [2004/10] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la récupération et le recyclage d'un gaz de refroidissement | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0601601 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XY]US5897682 (KOAIZAWA HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 * * column 10, line 48 - column 12, line 24 * * column 12, line 26 - line 36 * * column 13, line 46 - line 61 * * column 14, line 40 - line 53 * [Y] 8; | [XY]US6253575 (CHLUDZINSKI PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,4 * * column 6, line 25 - line 28 * * column 7, line 8 - line 13 * * column 7, line 53 - column 57 * [Y] 8,8; | [YA]EP1136456 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] , [0036] - [0039]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-7,9-11; | [PDA]EP1316535 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [PDA] 1-11 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 2 * |